Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Allegany County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0254 /CH0092
Title
Allegany County - Criminal Procedure - Custody of Arrested Persons Before Release
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0255 /CH0093
Title
Allegany County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0449 (SB0393)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Allegany County Animal Shelter Adoption and Care Center
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0463 (SB0440)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Friends Aware Facility
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0467 /CH0118
Title
Allegany County - Roadside Solicitation of Money or Donations - Permit Duration
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0584 (SB0204)
Title
Bow Hunting - Possession of Handguns for Protection
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0593 (SB0298)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Maximum Speed Limits - Interstate 68
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0738
Title
Juvenile Law - Jurisdiction - False Statements About Destructive Devices or Toxic Materials
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0816 /CH0070 (SB0629/CH0069)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Allegany County - Video Lottery Facility Sales and Consumption
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1362 (SB0927)
Title
Allegany County - Board of Education - Ex Officio Member - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0254 /CH0092 Allegany County - Criminal Procedure - Custody of Arrested Persons Before Release By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 92
Judiciary
2/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0255 /CH0093 Allegany County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Appropriations
2/05/2013 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0449 (SB0393) Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Allegany County Animal Shelter Adoption and Care Center By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0463 (SB0440) Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Friends Aware Facility By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0467 /CH0118 Allegany County - Roadside Solicitation of Money or Donations - Permit Duration By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 118
Environmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0584 (SB0204) Bow Hunting - Possession of Handguns for Protection By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0593 (SB0298) Vehicle Laws - Maximum Speed Limits - Interstate 68 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 PM
HB0738 Juvenile Law - Jurisdiction - False Statements About Destructive Devices or Toxic Materials By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0816 /CH0070 (SB0629/CH0069) Alcoholic Beverages - Allegany County - Video Lottery Facility Sales and Consumption By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 70
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1362 (SB0927) Allegany County - Board of Education - Ex Officio Member - Repeal By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM