Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Allegany County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0343 (SB0383/CH0295)
Title
Allegany County and Garrett County - Boards of Education - Removal of Ex Officio Member
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0516 (SB0531)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Friends Aware Facility
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0689 (SB0599)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Allegany County Animal Shelter Adoption and Care Center
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0691 (SB0605/CH0538)
Title
Property Tax Credit - Upper Stories of Commercial Structures - Rehabilitation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1444 (SB1037)
Title
Allegany County - Marriage License Fees - Distribution to Cumberland Historic Cemetery Organization
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1445 (SB1023)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Heart Disease and Hypertension Presumption - Allegany County Correctional Officers
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1493 /CH0253 (SB1074)
Title
Allegany County - Deputy Sheriffs - Meals on Duty
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0343 (SB0383/CH0295) Allegany County and Garrett County - Boards of Education - Removal of Ex Officio Member By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Ways and Means
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0516 (SB0531) Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Friends Aware Facility By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB0689 (SB0599) Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Allegany County Animal Shelter Adoption and Care Center By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB0691 (SB0605/CH0538) Property Tax Credit - Upper Stories of Commercial Structures - Rehabilitation By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1444 (SB1037) Allegany County - Marriage License Fees - Distribution to Cumberland Historic Cemetery Organization By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1445 (SB1023) Workers' Compensation - Heart Disease and Hypertension Presumption - Allegany County Correctional Officers By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1493 /CH0253 (SB1074) Allegany County - Deputy Sheriffs - Meals on Duty By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253
Environmental Matters
3/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM