Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Allegany County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0155 (SB0642)
Title
Video Lottery Terminals - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Use of Proceeds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0156 (SB0133/CH0153)
Title
Environment - Bay Restoration Fund - Use of Funds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0178 (SB0722)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Frostburg Museum Relocation Project
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0320 (SB0253)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Allegany County Animal Shelter Adoption and Care Center
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0330 (SB0643/CH0190)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries - Additional License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0515 /CH0255 (SB0644)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Allegany County - Class B-MB (Micro-Brewery/Restaurant) License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0525 (SB0348)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Allegany County - Special Beer Festival License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1142 (SB0824)
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Allegany County - Warrant Intercept Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1150 (SB0825)
Title
Allegany County - Video Lottery Facilities - Distribution of Proceeds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0155 (SB0642) Video Lottery Terminals - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Use of Proceeds By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0156 (SB0133/CH0153) Environment - Bay Restoration Fund - Use of Funds By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0178 (SB0722) Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Frostburg Museum Relocation Project By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2015 - 3:00 PM
HB0320 (SB0253) Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Allegany County Animal Shelter Adoption and Care Center By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2015 - 3:00 PM
HB0330 (SB0643/CH0190) Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries - Additional License By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0515 /CH0255 (SB0644) Alcoholic Beverages - Allegany County - Class B-MB (Micro-Brewery/Restaurant) License By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 255
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0525 (SB0348) Alcoholic Beverages - Allegany County - Special Beer Festival License By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1142 (SB0824) Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Allegany County - Warrant Intercept Program By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1150 (SB0825) Allegany County - Video Lottery Facilities - Distribution of Proceeds By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM