Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Allegany County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0681 (SB0592/CH0693)
Title
Allegany County - Property Tax Credit - Frostburg Museum Association
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0805 (SB0662)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Coal Miner Memorial Statue
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0809 (SB0638)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Cumberland YMCA Youth Center
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0858 (SB0639/CH0471)
Title
Allegany County - Sheriff's Deputies - Salary and Duties
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0923 /CH0470
Title
Allegany County - Property Tax Credits - Community Organizations and Lions Center
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0981 (SB0664/CH0690)
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1096 /CH0145
Title
Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales and Privileges
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1496
Title
Tax Sales - Property Maintenance and Nuisance Condition Violation Judgments
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0681 (SB0592/CH0693) Allegany County - Property Tax Credit - Frostburg Museum Association By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0805 (SB0662) Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Coal Miner Memorial Statue By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 4:00 PM
HB0809 (SB0638) Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Cumberland YMCA Youth Center By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 4:00 PM
HB0858 (SB0639/CH0471) Allegany County - Sheriff's Deputies - Salary and Duties By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0923 /CH0470 Allegany County - Property Tax Credits - Community Organizations and Lions Center By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Ways and Means
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0981 (SB0664/CH0690) Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
3/02/2017 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1096 /CH0145 Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales and Privileges By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 145
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1496 Tax Sales - Property Maintenance and Nuisance Condition Violation Judgments By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM