Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Appropriations Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0103 /CH0205
Title
Department of Human Resources and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Renaming
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0104
Title
Central Collection Unit - Collection of Debt - Liens
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0105
Title
Program Open Space - Apportionment Formula and Committee
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0134 /CH0105
Title
Homelessness and Supportive Services - Transfer to Department of Housing and Community Development
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0199 /CH0116
Title
Capital Grants for Senior Citizen Activities Centers
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0717 /CH0143
Title
Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0103 /CH0205 Department of Human Resources and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Renaming By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205
Appropriations
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0104 Central Collection Unit - Collection of Debt - Liens By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0105 Program Open Space - Apportionment Formula and Committee By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Appropriations
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0134 /CH0105 Homelessness and Supportive Services - Transfer to Department of Housing and Community Development By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105
Appropriations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0199 /CH0116 Capital Grants for Senior Citizen Activities Centers By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Appropriations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0717 /CH0143 Academic Facilities Bonding Authority By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 143
Appropriations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM