Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Appropriations Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0179 /CH0146
Title
Correctional Services - Patuxent Institution - Appointing Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0370 /CH0094
Title
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Police Force - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0469 /CH0273
Title
Supplemental Retirement Plans - Investments - Procurement of Investment Management Services
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1352 /CH0148
Title
University System of Maryland - Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1425 /CH0221
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Development of Supplemental Facilities to Benefit Camden Yards
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1407 /CH0016 (SB1040)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2019
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0179 /CH0146 Correctional Services - Patuxent Institution - Appointing Authority By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 146
Appropriations
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0370 /CH0094 Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Police Force - Repeal By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Appropriations
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0469 /CH0273 Supplemental Retirement Plans - Investments - Procurement of Investment Management Services By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 273
Appropriations
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2019 - 9:00 AM
HB1352 /CH0148 University System of Maryland - Academic Facilities Bonding Authority By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 148
Appropriations
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1425 /CH0221 Maryland Stadium Authority - Development of Supplemental Facilities to Benefit Camden Yards By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 221
Appropriations
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1407 /CH0016 (SB1040) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2019 By Request - Other 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 16
Appropriations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM