Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Budget And Taxation Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0076 /CH0156
Title
Enterprise Zones - Reimbursements to Local Governments - Schedule
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0280 /CH0061
Title
Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0076 /CH0156 Enterprise Zones - Reimbursements to Local Governments - Schedule By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 156
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0280 /CH0061 Academic Facilities Bonding Authority By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM