Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Baltimore City Senators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0263 (HB0354/CH0396)
Title
Baltimore City - AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0264 (HB0312)
Title
Criminal Law - Assault on Baltimore City Special Enforcement Officer - Prohibition
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0266 (HB0313/CH0594)
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refund - Baltimore City - Warrants
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0267 /CH0478 (HB0314/CH0479)
Title
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - Newly Constructed Dwellings
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0390 /CH0493 (HB0386)
Title
Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Driver's License - Points
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0263 (HB0354/CH0396) Baltimore City - AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange Program By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0264 (HB0312) Criminal Law - Assault on Baltimore City Special Enforcement Officer - Prohibition By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0266 (HB0313/CH0594) Maryland Income Tax Refund - Baltimore City - Warrants By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 PM
Ways and Means
4/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0267 /CH0478 (HB0314/CH0479) Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - Newly Constructed Dwellings By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 478
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0390 /CH0493 (HB0386) Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Driver's License - Points By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 493
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM