Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Baltimore County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0088 /CH0850
Title
Education - Selection of Members to the Baltimore County School Board
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0183
Title
Education - Career Exploration and Development Activities - Coffee (Java Act)
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0220
Title
Foreclosures - Baltimore County - Certificate of Vacancy or Certificate of Property Unfit for Human Habitation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0750
Title
Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Fallen or Disabled Law Enforcement Officers and Rescue Workers - Acquisition of Dwelling
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1579 /CH0510 (SB1099/CH0511)
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2016 - Baltimore County - Morning Star Family Life Center
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0088 /CH0850 Education - Selection of Members to the Baltimore County School Board By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 850
Ways and Means
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0183 Education - Career Exploration and Development Activities - Coffee (Java Act) By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-1)
Ways and Means
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0220 Foreclosures - Baltimore County - Certificate of Vacancy or Certificate of Property Unfit for Human Habitation By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0750 Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Fallen or Disabled Law Enforcement Officers and Rescue Workers - Acquisition of Dwelling By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1579 /CH0510 (SB1099/CH0511) Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2016 - Baltimore County - Morning Star Family Life Center By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Appropriations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM