Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Baltimore County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0217
Title
Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association Standing
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0381
Title
Baltimore County Anti–Bullying Task Force – Alterations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0449 /CH0657 (SB0451/CH0658)
Title
Baltimore County – Development Impact Fees – Authorization and Use of Funds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0507
Title
Baltimore County and Harford County – Motorcycles – Sunday Sales
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0518 (SB0446)
Title
Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit Exemption
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0217 Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association Standing By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0381 Baltimore County Anti–Bullying Task Force – Alterations By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0449 /CH0657 (SB0451/CH0658) Baltimore County – Development Impact Fees – Authorization and Use of Funds By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 657
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0507 Baltimore County and Harford County – Motorcycles – Sunday Sales By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - House Requests Senate Recede
Economic Matters
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0518 (SB0446) Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit Exemption By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM