Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Calvert County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0802 (SB0458/CH0056)
Title
Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0822 (SB0656/CH0516)
Title
Calvert County - Property Tax - Natural Gas Facility
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1273
Title
Education - Calvert County Board of Education - Annual Audit
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1448 /CH0338
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0802 (SB0458/CH0056) Calvert County - Public Facilities Bonds By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0822 (SB0656/CH0516) Calvert County - Property Tax - Natural Gas Facility By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB1273 Education - Calvert County Board of Education - Annual Audit By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1448 /CH0338 Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 338
Economic Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM