Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Carroll County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0156 /CH0524
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Fee Increases
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0158 (SB0037)
Title
Carroll County - Gaming
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0181 (SB0040/CH0008)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Carroll County - Fees for Appearance of Counsel
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0182 (SB0557/CH0064)
Title
Carroll County - Sheriff - Salary
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0183 (SB0558/CH0303)
Title
Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act - Industrial Development Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0210 (SB0561)
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permit
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0211 (SB0556/CH0179)
Title
Carroll County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0360
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages License Fees - Underage Drinking
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0369 (SB0559)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - The Arc of Carroll County Building Renovation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0545 (SB0555/CH0063)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0156 /CH0524 Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Fee Increases By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 524
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0158 (SB0037) Carroll County - Gaming By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Luedtke)
Ways and Means
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0181 (SB0040/CH0008) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Carroll County - Fees for Appearance of Counsel By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0182 (SB0557/CH0064) Carroll County - Sheriff - Salary By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0183 (SB0558/CH0303) Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act - Industrial Development Authority By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0210 (SB0561) Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permit By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0211 (SB0556/CH0179) Carroll County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0360 Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages License Fees - Underage Drinking By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0369 (SB0559) Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - The Arc of Carroll County Building Renovation By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0545 (SB0555/CH0063) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM