Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Carroll County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0115 /CH0221 (SB0721)
Title
Carroll County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0116 (SB0034)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - The Arc of Carroll County Building Renovation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0117 /CH0222 (SB0719)
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hours of Sale on Sundays for Holders of Class A Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0126 (SB0720)
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Carroll County - Warrant Intercept Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0280
Title
Carroll County - Gaming Events
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0296 /CH0084 (SB0663)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0115 /CH0221 (SB0721) Carroll County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 221
Appropriations
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0116 (SB0034) Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - The Arc of Carroll County Building Renovation By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/16/2015 - 9:00 AM
HB0117 /CH0222 (SB0719) Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hours of Sale on Sundays for Holders of Class A Licenses By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 222
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0126 (SB0720) Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Carroll County - Warrant Intercept Program By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0280 Carroll County - Gaming Events By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Ways and Means
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2015 - 2:00 PM
HB0296 /CH0084 (SB0663) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 84
Appropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM