Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Carroll County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0218 /CH0433 (SB0107)
Title
Carroll County - Huckster, Hawker, or Peddler License - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0219 /CH0046
Title
Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0249 (SB0324/CH0434)
Title
Carroll County - Mechanical Musical Devices - Licensing Requirements - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0251 /CH0435 (SB0323)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0479 (SB0606)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - Union Mills Homestead Restoration
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0545
Title
Carroll County - Gaming - Home Games - Bingo
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0565 /CH0121 (SB0372/CH0122)
Title
Carroll County - Detention Center - Polygraph Testing
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0573 (SB0456/CH0437)
Title
Carroll County - State's Attorney - Salary
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0574 (SB0457/CH0436)
Title
Carroll County - Sheriff's Salary
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1005 (SB0840)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - Boys and Girls Club of Westminster
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0218 /CH0433 (SB0107) Carroll County - Huckster, Hawker, or Peddler License - Repeal By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 433
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0219 /CH0046 Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 46
Judiciary
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0249 (SB0324/CH0434) Carroll County - Mechanical Musical Devices - Licensing Requirements - Repeal By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0251 /CH0435 (SB0323) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 435
Appropriations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0479 (SB0606) Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - Union Mills Homestead Restoration By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 4:00 PM
HB0545 Carroll County - Gaming - Home Games - Bingo By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0565 /CH0121 (SB0372/CH0122) Carroll County - Detention Center - Polygraph Testing By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Judiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0573 (SB0456/CH0437) Carroll County - State's Attorney - Salary By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0574 (SB0457/CH0436) Carroll County - Sheriff's Salary By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1005 (SB0840) Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - Boys and Girls Club of Westminster By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 4:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM