Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Carroll County Senators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0037 (HB0158)
Title
Carroll County - Gaming
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0040 /CH0008 (HB0181)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Carroll County - Fees for Appearance of Counsel
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0555 /CH0063 (HB0545)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0556 /CH0179 (HB0211)
Title
Carroll County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0557 /CH0064 (HB0182)
Title
Carroll County - Sheriff - Salary
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0558 /CH0303 (HB0183)
Title
Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act - Industrial Development Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0559 (HB0369)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - The Arc of Carroll County Building Renovation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0560 /CH0523
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Fees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0561 (HB0210)
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permit
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0037 (HB0158) Carroll County - Gaming By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-1)
Budget and Taxation
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0040 /CH0008 (HB0181) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Carroll County - Fees for Appearance of Counsel By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 8
Judicial Proceedings
1/21/2014 - 1:30 PM
Judiciary
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0555 /CH0063 (HB0545) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0556 /CH0179 (HB0211) Carroll County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 179
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0557 /CH0064 (HB0182) Carroll County - Sheriff - Salary By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 64
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0558 /CH0303 (HB0183) Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act - Industrial Development Authority By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 303
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0559 (HB0369) Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - The Arc of Carroll County Building Renovation By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 4:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2014 - 4:00 PM
SB0560 /CH0523 Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Fees By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 523
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0561 (HB0210) Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permit By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM