Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Carroll County Senators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0296 (HB0205/CH0254)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0298 (HB0176)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - The Arc of Carroll County Building Renovation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0677 (HB0737/CH0275)
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Beginning Hour of Sale
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0952 (HB0894)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - Sykesville Freedom District Fire Department
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0296 (HB0205/CH0254) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0298 (HB0176) Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - The Arc of Carroll County Building Renovation By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 2:00 PM
SB0677 (HB0737/CH0275) Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Beginning Hour of Sale By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0952 (HB0894) Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - Sykesville Freedom District Fire Department By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM