Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Carroll County Senators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0107 (HB0218/CH0433)
Title
Carroll County - Huckster, Hawker, or Peddler License - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0323 (HB0251/CH0435)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0324 /CH0434 (HB0249)
Title
Carroll County - Mechanical Musical Devices - Licensing Requirements - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0372 /CH0122 (HB0565/CH0121)
Title
Carroll County - Detention Center - Polygraph Testing
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0456 /CH0437 (HB0573)
Title
Carroll County - State's Attorney - Salary
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0457 /CH0436 (HB0574)
Title
Carroll County - Sheriff's Salary
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0606 (HB0479)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - Union Mills Homestead Restoration
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0840 (HB1005)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - Boys and Girls Club of Westminster
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0107 (HB0218/CH0433) Carroll County - Huckster, Hawker, or Peddler License - Repeal By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0323 (HB0251/CH0435) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Budget and Taxation
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0324 /CH0434 (HB0249) Carroll County - Mechanical Musical Devices - Licensing Requirements - Repeal By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 434
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0372 /CH0122 (HB0565/CH0121) Carroll County - Detention Center - Polygraph Testing By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Finance
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0456 /CH0437 (HB0573) Carroll County - State's Attorney - Salary By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 437
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0457 /CH0436 (HB0574) Carroll County - Sheriff's Salary By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 436
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0606 (HB0479) Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - Union Mills Homestead Restoration By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 2:00 PM
SB0840 (HB1005) Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - Boys and Girls Club of Westminster By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM