Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Carroll County Senators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0275 /CH0267 (HB0610/CH0266)
Title
Carroll County - Gaming - Repeal of Sunday Prohibition
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0359 /CH0264 (HB0621/CH0265)
Title
Carroll County - Board of Education - Student Representative
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0360 (HB0609/CH0089)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0437 (HB1000)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - Boys and Girls Club of Westminster
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0542 /CH0269 (HB0984/CH0268)
Title
Carroll County - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0735 /CH0832 (HB0885/CH0831)
Title
Carroll County - Board of Education - Compensation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1152 (HB1116/CH0493)
Title
Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit Exemption
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0275 /CH0267 (HB0610/CH0266) Carroll County - Gaming - Repeal of Sunday Prohibition By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267
Budget and Taxation
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0359 /CH0264 (HB0621/CH0265) Carroll County - Board of Education - Student Representative By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 264
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/07/2018 - 12:45 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0360 (HB0609/CH0089) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Budget and Taxation
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 PM
SB0437 (HB1000) Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - Boys and Girls Club of Westminster By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 2:00 PM
SB0542 /CH0269 (HB0984/CH0268) Carroll County - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 269
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0735 /CH0832 (HB0885/CH0831) Carroll County - Board of Education - Compensation By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 832
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1152 (HB1116/CH0493) Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit Exemption By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM