Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Cecil County Senators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0714 (HB0767)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - YMCA of Cecil County Outdoor Pool
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0715 (HB0832/CH0125)
Title
Cecil County - Marriage Licenses - Applications
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0716 /CH0575 (HB0246/CH0576)
Title
Public Safety - Fire Police - Cecil County
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0733 (HB0761)
Title
Cecil County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0958 /CH0454 (HB1071/CH0455)
Title
Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0714 (HB0767) Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - YMCA of Cecil County Outdoor Pool By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 11:00 AM
SB0715 (HB0832/CH0125) Cecil County - Marriage Licenses - Applications By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0716 /CH0575 (HB0246/CH0576) Public Safety - Fire Police - Cecil County By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 575
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0733 (HB0761) Cecil County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0958 /CH0454 (HB1071/CH0455) Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM