Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Cecil County Senators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0817 /CH0531 (HB1547)
Title
Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit Exemption
Sponsorship Type
Co-Sponsor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0118
Title
Cecil County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0211 /CH0078 (HB0629/CH0079)
Title
Cecil County - Orphans' Court Judges - Travel Expense Allowance
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0708 (HB0977)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Fair Hill Race Course
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0816 /CH0313 (HB1201/CH0312)
Title
Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Tasting License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1167 (HB1653)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Elkton Sportsplex Campus and Performing-Visual Arts Center
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0817 /CH0531 (HB1547) Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit Exemption Co-Sponsor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0118 Cecil County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/01/2017 - 2:00 PM
SB0211 /CH0078 (HB0629/CH0079) Cecil County - Orphans' Court Judges - Travel Expense Allowance By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0708 (HB0977) Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Fair Hill Race Course By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 2:00 PM
SB0816 /CH0313 (HB1201/CH0312) Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Tasting License By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 313
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1167 (HB1653) Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Elkton Sportsplex Campus and Performing-Visual Arts Center By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM