Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Economic Matters Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0005
Title
State Board of Plumbing - Continuing Professional Competency - Master Plumbers and Master Natural Gas Fitters
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0006 /CH0211
Title
Maryland Home Improvement Commission - Guaranty Fund - Claims
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0467 /CH0100
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment of Minors
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0468
Title
Maryland Economic Development Assistance Fund - Training and Technology Projects
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1417 /CH0251
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Work Sharing
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0005 State Board of Plumbing - Continuing Professional Competency - Master Plumbers and Master Natural Gas Fitters By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0006 /CH0211 Maryland Home Improvement Commission - Guaranty Fund - Claims By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Economic Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0467 /CH0100 Labor and Employment - Employment of Minors By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 100
Economic Matters
2/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0468 Maryland Economic Development Assistance Fund - Training and Technology Projects By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1417 /CH0251 Unemployment Insurance - Work Sharing By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 251
Economic Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM