Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Economic Matters Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0135 /CH0250
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Electronic Transmission of Information and Documents - Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0136 /CH0106
Title
Insurance - Public Adjusters
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0137 /CH0245 (SB0021/CH0244)
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits - Collection by Assessment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0138 /CH0247 (SB0006/CH0246)
Title
Occupational and Professional Licensing Boards, Commissions, and Regulatory Entities - Notifications of Applicants, Licensees, Registrants, and Permit Holders
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0139 /CH0251
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Employer Determinations - Process and Appeal Rights
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0140 /CH0252
Title
State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - Supervision of Appraiser Trainees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0141 /CH0248 (SB0017/CH0249)
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Eligibility for Benefits - Business Operation Closings
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0161
Title
Department of Commerce - Maryland Economic Development Assistance Authority and Fund - Renaming and Restructuring
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0182 /CH0253
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation and State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Licensees - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0245 /CH0259
Title
Department of Commerce - Maryland Advisory Commission on Manufacturing Competitiveness - Renaming and Restructuring
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0246 /CH0254
Title
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - State Occupational Mechanical Licensing Boards - Fund and Fees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0247
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation and State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Reorganization and Miscellaneous Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0248 /CH0255
Title
Maryland Home Improvement Commission - Special Fund and Fees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0250 /CH0256
Title
State Board of Barbers and State Board of Cosmetologists - Special Fund and Fees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0810 /CH0257
Title
Apprenticeships - Apprenticeship and Training Council - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0142 (SB0033)
Title
Financial Institutions - Mortgage Lenders - Examinations and Records
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0135 /CH0250 Unemployment Insurance - Electronic Transmission of Information and Documents - Authority By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 250
Economic Matters
1/26/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0136 /CH0106 Insurance - Public Adjusters By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
Economic Matters
1/26/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0137 /CH0245 (SB0021/CH0244) Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits - Collection by Assessment By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 245
Economic Matters
1/26/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0138 /CH0247 (SB0006/CH0246) Occupational and Professional Licensing Boards, Commissions, and Regulatory Entities - Notifications of Applicants, Licensees, Registrants, and Permit Holders By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 247
Economic Matters
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0139 /CH0251 Unemployment Insurance - Employer Determinations - Process and Appeal Rights By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 251
Economic Matters
1/26/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0140 /CH0252 State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - Supervision of Appraiser Trainees By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 252
Economic Matters
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0141 /CH0248 (SB0017/CH0249) Unemployment Insurance - Eligibility for Benefits - Business Operation Closings By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 248
Economic Matters
1/26/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0161 Department of Commerce - Maryland Economic Development Assistance Authority and Fund - Renaming and Restructuring By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0182 /CH0253 Commissioner of Financial Regulation and State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Licensees - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253
Economic Matters
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0245 /CH0259 Department of Commerce - Maryland Advisory Commission on Manufacturing Competitiveness - Renaming and Restructuring By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 259
Economic Matters
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0246 /CH0254 Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - State Occupational Mechanical Licensing Boards - Fund and Fees By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 254
Economic Matters
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0247 Commissioner of Financial Regulation and State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Reorganization and Miscellaneous Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0248 /CH0255 Maryland Home Improvement Commission - Special Fund and Fees By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 255
Economic Matters
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0250 /CH0256 State Board of Barbers and State Board of Cosmetologists - Special Fund and Fees By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Economic Matters
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0810 /CH0257 Apprenticeships - Apprenticeship and Training Council - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257
Economic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0142 (SB0033) Financial Institutions - Mortgage Lenders - Examinations and Records By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM