Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Education, Health, And Environmental Affairs Com, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0102
Title
Governor's Office for Children and Services to Children
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0103 (HB0446/CH0620)
Title
State Government - Maryland Youth Advisory Council - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0104 /CH0018
Title
Housing and Community Development - Local Government Infrastructure Projects - Financing
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0105
Title
Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal Authority - Name and Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0106 /CH0349
Title
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - State Board of Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors - Authority of the Secretary
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0107 /CH0047
Title
Military Department - Summary Courts-Martial - Penalties
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0108 /CH0159
Title
Nurse Support Program Assistance Fund - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0109 /CH0048
Title
Health Occupations Boards - Criminal History Records Checks - Required
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0110 /CH0019
Title
Agriculture - Young Farmers Advisory Board - Membership
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0111 /CH0020
Title
State Lottery - Licensed Agents - Prize Payments
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0112 /CH0021
Title
Pest Control Compact - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0113 /CH0022
Title
Department of Agriculture - Bees, Bee Colonies, and Used Bee Equipment - Transportation and Shipment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0281 /CH0062
Title
State Government - Members of the National Guard - Active Duty - Employment Protection
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0282 /CH0185
Title
Early Childhood Development - Transfer of Provisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0285 /CH0370
Title
Maryland Home Improvement Commission - Subcontractor Licensing Requirement - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0001 /JR0001
Title
Patuxent River Watershed - Amendment of Patuxent River Policy Plan
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0200 /CH0359 (HB0497/CH0360)
Title
Health Occupations - State Board of Environmental Health Specialists - Sunset Extension and Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0102 Governor's Office for Children and Services to Children By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Finance (Senator Conway) Adopted
Finance
1/20/2016 - 3:00 PM
SB0103 (HB0446/CH0620) State Government - Maryland Youth Advisory Council - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0104 /CH0018 Housing and Community Development - Local Government Infrastructure Projects - Financing By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 18
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0105 Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal Authority - Name and Authority By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2016 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0106 /CH0349 Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - State Board of Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors - Authority of the Secretary By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0107 /CH0047 Military Department - Summary Courts-Martial - Penalties By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 47
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0108 /CH0159 Nurse Support Program Assistance Fund - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0109 /CH0048 Health Occupations Boards - Criminal History Records Checks - Required By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 48
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0110 /CH0019 Agriculture - Young Farmers Advisory Board - Membership By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 19
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2016 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0111 /CH0020 State Lottery - Licensed Agents - Prize Payments By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 20
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0112 /CH0021 Pest Control Compact - Repeal By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 21
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2016 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0113 /CH0022 Department of Agriculture - Bees, Bee Colonies, and Used Bee Equipment - Transportation and Shipment By Request - Departmental 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 22
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2016 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0281 /CH0062 State Government - Members of the National Guard - Active Duty - Employment Protection By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0282 /CH0185 Early Childhood Development - Transfer of Provisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0285 /CH0370 Maryland Home Improvement Commission - Subcontractor Licensing Requirement - Repeal By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 370
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SJ0001 /JR0001 Patuxent River Watershed - Amendment of Patuxent River Policy Plan By Request - Departmental 5 2 Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 1
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2016 - 2:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
4/01/2016 - 3:00 PM
SB0200 /CH0359 (HB0497/CH0360) Health Occupations - State Board of Environmental Health Specialists - Sunset Extension and Revisions By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 359
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM