Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Education, Health, And Environmental Affairs Com, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0008 /CH0656
Title
State Board of Nursing - Maryland Nurse Practice Act - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0040 /CH0150
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Exemption From Department of Information Technology Oversight
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0043 /CH0373 (HB0193/CH0374)
Title
High School Diploma by Examination - Eligibility Requirements - Exemption
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0058 /CH0411
Title
State Board for Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0062 /CH0658
Title
Maryland Chiropractic Act - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0077 /CH0046 (HB0188/CH0045)
Title
State Board of Architects and State Board for Professional Land Surveyors - Membership
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0080 /CH0659
Title
State Board of Occupational Therapy Practice - Licensure - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0085 /CH0369
Title
Tuition Waivers - Foster Care Recipients - Eligibility
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0089 /CH0060
Title
Chesapeake Bay and Coastal Zone Advisory Commission and Captive Wildlife Advisory Committee - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0094 /CH0670
Title
Natural Resources – Unprotected Birds and Mammals
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0100 /CH0063
Title
Reservoir, Dam, or Waterway Obstruction Plans - Designation of Approval Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0106 /CH0048 (HB0201/CH0047)
Title
State Board for Professional Engineers - Examination Requirements - Engineer-in-Training
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0110 /CH0662
Title
State Board of Podiatric Medical Examiners – Licensure – Qualifications and Examinations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0112 /CH0061
Title
Natural Resources - Tidal Fish Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0113 /CH0062
Title
Natural Resources - Recreational License Incentive Discount Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0552 /CH0757 (HB0742/CH0756)
Title
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0008 /CH0656 State Board of Nursing - Maryland Nurse Practice Act - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 656
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/18/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0040 /CH0150 Maryland Stadium Authority - Exemption From Department of Information Technology Oversight By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 150
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/11/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0043 /CH0373 (HB0193/CH0374) High School Diploma by Examination - Eligibility Requirements - Exemption By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Finance
1/16/2018 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
Ways and Means
SB0058 /CH0411 State Board for Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 411
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/18/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0062 /CH0658 Maryland Chiropractic Act - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 658
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/18/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0077 /CH0046 (HB0188/CH0045) State Board of Architects and State Board for Professional Land Surveyors - Membership By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 46
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/11/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0080 /CH0659 State Board of Occupational Therapy Practice - Licensure - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 659
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/18/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0085 /CH0369 Tuition Waivers - Foster Care Recipients - Eligibility By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 369
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0089 /CH0060 Chesapeake Bay and Coastal Zone Advisory Commission and Captive Wildlife Advisory Committee - Repeal By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 60
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0094 /CH0670 Natural Resources – Unprotected Birds and Mammals By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 670
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0100 /CH0063 Reservoir, Dam, or Waterway Obstruction Plans - Designation of Approval Authority By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0106 /CH0048 (HB0201/CH0047) State Board for Professional Engineers - Examination Requirements - Engineer-in-Training By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 48
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/11/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0110 /CH0662 State Board of Podiatric Medical Examiners – Licensure – Qualifications and Examinations By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 662
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/18/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0112 /CH0061 Natural Resources - Tidal Fish Licenses By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0113 /CH0062 Natural Resources - Recreational License Incentive Discount Program By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0552 /CH0757 (HB0742/CH0756) State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 757
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM