Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Education, Health, And Environmental Affairs Com, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0007 /CH0080
Title
Natural Resources – Regulation and Use of Commercial Finfish Gear
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0010 /CH0081
Title
Natural Resources - Oysters, Clams, and Clamming - Licenses and Regulations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0027
Title
State Archives – Acquisition of Fine Art or Decorative Art – Procurement Exemption
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0054 /CH0137
Title
Surface Mining – Zone of Dewatering Influence – Remedies
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0055 /CH0144
Title
Department of Planning - Central Depository
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0056 /CH0128
Title
Secretary of Agriculture - Regulation of Poultry to Protect Animal Health and Control Avian Influenza
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0057 /CH0129
Title
Agriculture - County Agricultural Land Preservation Programs
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0058 /CH0130
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation – Board of Trustees and Elimination of District Agreements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0074 /CH0147
Title
Higher Education - Charles W. Riley Firefighter and Ambulance and Rescue Squad Member Scholarship - Alterations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0079 /CH0149
Title
Public Ethics - Lobbyist Registration and Reporting - Mandatory Electronic Filing
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0877 /CH0272
Title
Waterway Improvement Fund - Public Boating Construction Projects - Financing Limits
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0007 /CH0080 Natural Resources – Regulation and Use of Commercial Finfish Gear By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/2019 - 3:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0010 /CH0081 Natural Resources - Oysters, Clams, and Clamming - Licenses and Regulations By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/2019 - 3:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0027 State Archives – Acquisition of Fine Art or Decorative Art – Procurement Exemption By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Senate Requests House Recede
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/10/2019 - 2:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0054 /CH0137 Surface Mining – Zone of Dewatering Influence – Remedies By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 137
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2019 - 4:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0055 /CH0144 Department of Planning - Central Depository By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 144
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/10/2019 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0056 /CH0128 Secretary of Agriculture - Regulation of Poultry to Protect Animal Health and Control Avian Influenza By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 128
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2019 - 4:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0057 /CH0129 Agriculture - County Agricultural Land Preservation Programs By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2019 - 4:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0058 /CH0130 Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation – Board of Trustees and Elimination of District Agreements By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2019 - 4:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0074 /CH0147 Higher Education - Charles W. Riley Firefighter and Ambulance and Rescue Squad Member Scholarship - Alterations By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2019 - 3:30 PM
Appropriations
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0079 /CH0149 Public Ethics - Lobbyist Registration and Reporting - Mandatory Electronic Filing By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/10/2019 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0877 /CH0272 Waterway Improvement Fund - Public Boating Construction Projects - Financing Limits By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM