Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Environmental Matters Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0095 /CH0608
Title
Environment - Permits - New Source Performance Standards
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0096 /CH0080
Title
Natural Resources - Restricted Shellfish Harvest Areas - Water Testing
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0097 /CH0081
Title
Environment - Sediment Control and Stormwater Management Plans - Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0362 /CH0615
Title
Public Ethics - Definition of "Interest" - Mutual Funds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0420 /CH0113
Title
Vehicle Laws - Maryland Transportation Authority - Payment of Tolls
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0613 /CH0624
Title
Sustainable Communities - Designation and Financing
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0706 /CH0384
Title
Natural Resources - Forest Preservation Act of 2013
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1429 /CH0418
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Former Officials and Employees - Employment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1440 /CH0686
Title
Recycling - Composting Facilities
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0095 /CH0608 Environment - Permits - New Source Performance Standards By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 608
Environmental Matters
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0096 /CH0080 Natural Resources - Restricted Shellfish Harvest Areas - Water Testing By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
Environmental Matters
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0097 /CH0081 Environment - Sediment Control and Stormwater Management Plans - Authority By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Environmental Matters
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0362 /CH0615 Public Ethics - Definition of "Interest" - Mutual Funds By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 615
Environmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0420 /CH0113 Vehicle Laws - Maryland Transportation Authority - Payment of Tolls By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113
Environmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0613 /CH0624 Sustainable Communities - Designation and Financing By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 624
Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
4/02/2013 - 1:30 PM
HB0706 /CH0384 Natural Resources - Forest Preservation Act of 2013 By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384
Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1429 /CH0418 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Former Officials and Employees - Employment By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 418
Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1440 /CH0686 Recycling - Composting Facilities By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 686
Environmental Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM