Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Finance Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0065 /CH0016
Title
Workers' Compensation - Claim Processing - Electronic Delivery of Decisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0079
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Advisory Councils - Renaming and Termination
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0080 /CH0177
Title
Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Disclosure of Prescription Monitoring Data
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0081 /CH0020
Title
Education and Workforce Training Coordinating Council for Correctional Institutions - Membership
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0082 /CH0441
Title
Elevator Safety - Third-Party Inspectors - Certification
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0083 /CH0178
Title
Department of Aging - Aging and Disability Resource Center Program - Maryland Access Point
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0085 /CH0021
Title
Maryland Port Commission - Management Personnel Appointments - Operating and Managing Port Facilities
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0305 /CH0224 (HB0296)
Title
Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0065 /CH0016 Workers' Compensation - Claim Processing - Electronic Delivery of Decisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 16
Finance
1/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0079 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Advisory Councils - Renaming and Termination By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/16/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0080 /CH0177 Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Disclosure of Prescription Monitoring Data By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 177
Finance
1/17/2013 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0081 /CH0020 Education and Workforce Training Coordinating Council for Correctional Institutions - Membership By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 20
Finance
1/16/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0082 /CH0441 Elevator Safety - Third-Party Inspectors - Certification By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 441
Finance
1/16/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0083 /CH0178 Department of Aging - Aging and Disability Resource Center Program - Maryland Access Point By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Finance
1/17/2013 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0085 /CH0021 Maryland Port Commission - Management Personnel Appointments - Operating and Managing Port Facilities By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 21
Finance
1/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0305 /CH0224 (HB0296) Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224
Finance
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM