Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Finance Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0006 (HB0187/CH0479)
Title
Financial Institutions - Nondepository Special Fund - Expansion
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0017 /CH0657
Title
Health Information Exchanges - Definitions and Regulations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0026
Title
State Agency Loan Program and Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan Program - Merger
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0038 /CH0526
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration – Birth Certificates – Issuance of Copies
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0043 /CH0373 (HB0193/CH0374)
Title
High School Diploma by Examination - Eligibility Requirements - Exemption
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0052 /CH0664
Title
Insurance - Medicare Supplement Policy Plans - Conformity to Federal Law
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0054 /CH0665
Title
Health Insurance – Technical Corrections and Required Conformity With Federal Law
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0057 /CH0666
Title
Insurance - Medical Professional Liability Insurance Policies - Technical Correction
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0059 /CH0042
Title
Insurance - Antifraud Plan Requirement - Application
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0064 /CH0159 (HB0200/CH0160)
Title
State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - Membership
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0067
Title
Department of Commerce - Maryland Economic Development Assistance Authority and Fund - Renaming and Revising
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0071 /CH0043
Title
Insurance - Certificates of Qualification for Surplus Lines Brokers - Suspensions and Revocations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0078 /CH0667
Title
Insurance - Risk Retention Groups - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0087 /CH0212
Title
Controlled Dangerous Substances - Registration, Schedules, Penalties, and Orders of Impoundment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0097 /CH0051
Title
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Disclosure of Records
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0105 /CH0660
Title
State Advisory Council on Hereditary and Congenital Disorders – Membership and Appointments
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0108 /CH0661
Title
Regulation of Health Care Programs, Medical Laboratories, Tissue Banks, and Health Care Facilities - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0111 /CH0663
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Criminal History Records Checks - Contractors With Access to Federal Tax Information
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0006 (HB0187/CH0479) Financial Institutions - Nondepository Special Fund - Expansion By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
1/17/2018 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0017 /CH0657 Health Information Exchanges - Definitions and Regulations By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 657
Finance
1/18/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0026 State Agency Loan Program and Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan Program - Merger By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Finance
1/11/2018 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0038 /CH0526 Motor Vehicle Administration – Birth Certificates – Issuance of Copies By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 526
Finance
1/17/2018 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0043 /CH0373 (HB0193/CH0374) High School Diploma by Examination - Eligibility Requirements - Exemption By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Finance
1/16/2018 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
Ways and Means
SB0052 /CH0664 Insurance - Medicare Supplement Policy Plans - Conformity to Federal Law By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 664
Finance
1/16/2018 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0054 /CH0665 Health Insurance – Technical Corrections and Required Conformity With Federal Law By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 665
Finance
1/11/2018 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0057 /CH0666 Insurance - Medical Professional Liability Insurance Policies - Technical Correction By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 666
Finance
1/11/2018 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0059 /CH0042 Insurance - Antifraud Plan Requirement - Application By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 42
Finance
1/16/2018 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0064 /CH0159 (HB0200/CH0160) State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - Membership By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Finance
1/11/2018 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0067 Department of Commerce - Maryland Economic Development Assistance Authority and Fund - Renaming and Revising By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Finance
1/18/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0071 /CH0043 Insurance - Certificates of Qualification for Surplus Lines Brokers - Suspensions and Revocations By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Finance
1/16/2018 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0078 /CH0667 Insurance - Risk Retention Groups - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 667
Finance
1/18/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0087 /CH0212 Controlled Dangerous Substances - Registration, Schedules, Penalties, and Orders of Impoundment By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212
Finance
1/18/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0097 /CH0051 Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Disclosure of Records By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 51
Finance
1/16/2018 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0105 /CH0660 State Advisory Council on Hereditary and Congenital Disorders – Membership and Appointments By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 660
Finance
1/11/2018 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0108 /CH0661 Regulation of Health Care Programs, Medical Laboratories, Tissue Banks, and Health Care Facilities - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 661
Finance
1/18/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0111 /CH0663 Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Criminal History Records Checks - Contractors With Access to Federal Tax Information By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 663
Finance
1/17/2018 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM