Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Frederick County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0037 /CH0218 (SB0025)
Title
Frederick Center for Research and Education in Science and Technology
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0242 (SB0502/CH0179)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Event Licenses and Promoter's License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0245 /CH0081 (SB0501)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Permit - Hours of Sale
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0246 /CH0232 (SB0503)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Notice for License Applications, Fees, and Inspectors
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0273 (SB0500/CH0178)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wine Events, Licensing, Alcohol Awareness Requirements, and Fines
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0274 /CH0234 (SB0510)
Title
Frederick County - Gaming Events
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0275 (SB0499/CH0177)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Class C (Retirement Center) License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0664 (SB0886/CH0055)
Title
Frederick County Property Tax Fairness Act of 2015 (Strengthening Frederick Municipalities)
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1181 (SB0844/CH0202)
Title
Frederick County - Deer Management Permit - Use of Rifles
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1240 (SB0902/CH0205)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0037 /CH0218 (SB0025) Frederick Center for Research and Education in Science and Technology By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 218
Appropriations
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0242 (SB0502/CH0179) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Event Licenses and Promoter's License By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0245 /CH0081 (SB0501) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Permit - Hours of Sale By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0246 /CH0232 (SB0503) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Notice for License Applications, Fees, and Inspectors By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 232
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0273 (SB0500/CH0178) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wine Events, Licensing, Alcohol Awareness Requirements, and Fines By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0274 /CH0234 (SB0510) Frederick County - Gaming Events By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 234
Ways and Means
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2015 - 2:00 PM
HB0275 (SB0499/CH0177) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Class C (Retirement Center) License By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0664 (SB0886/CH0055) Frederick County Property Tax Fairness Act of 2015 (Strengthening Frederick Municipalities) By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Ways and Means
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1181 (SB0844/CH0202) Frederick County - Deer Management Permit - Use of Rifles By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1240 (SB0902/CH0205) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM