Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Frederick County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0501 /CH0092 (SB0219/CH0091)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Seating Requirement for Class B Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0506 /CH0094 (SB0220/CH0093)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Arena License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0507 /CH0096 (SB0263/CH0095)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Banquet Facility License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0630 /CH0273 (SB0289/CH0272)
Title
Frederick County – Ethics and Campaign Activity – Governing Body, County Board and Commission Members, and Board of License Commissioners
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0762 /CH0277 (SB0447/CH0276)
Title
Frederick County – Alcoholic Beverages – Wine Privilege – Cheese and Deli Shops
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0826 (SB0503)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Helen Smith Studio
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0828 (SB0507)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Museum of the Ironworker
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0830 (SB0506)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Frederick County YMCA
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0831 (SB0504)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Northwest Trek Conservation and Education Center
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0833 (SB0505)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - CrossRoads Freedom Center Recovery Housing
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0917 /CH0275 (SB1032/CH0274)
Title
Frederick County - Scenic River Advisory Board - Composition
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1671 (SB1108)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Brunswick Junior Railroaders
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1673 (SB1232)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - The Ranch
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0501 /CH0092 (SB0219/CH0091) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Seating Requirement for Class B Licenses By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 92
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0506 /CH0094 (SB0220/CH0093) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Arena License By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0507 /CH0096 (SB0263/CH0095) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Banquet Facility License By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0630 /CH0273 (SB0289/CH0272) Frederick County – Ethics and Campaign Activity – Governing Body, County Board and Commission Members, and Board of License Commissioners By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 273
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0762 /CH0277 (SB0447/CH0276) Frederick County – Alcoholic Beverages – Wine Privilege – Cheese and Deli Shops By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0826 (SB0503) Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Helen Smith Studio By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 12:00 PM
HB0828 (SB0507) Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Museum of the Ironworker By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 12:00 PM
HB0830 (SB0506) Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Frederick County YMCA By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 12:00 PM
HB0831 (SB0504) Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Northwest Trek Conservation and Education Center By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 12:00 PM
HB0833 (SB0505) Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - CrossRoads Freedom Center Recovery Housing By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 12:00 PM
HB0917 /CH0275 (SB1032/CH0274) Frederick County - Scenic River Advisory Board - Composition By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 275
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1671 (SB1108) Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Brunswick Junior Railroaders By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 12:00 PM
HB1673 (SB1232) Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - The Ranch By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM