Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Harford County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0318
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Harford County - Warrant Intercept Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0322
Title
Harford County - Charitable Gaming
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0328 /CH0086
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Applications for Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0329 /CH0087
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Inspectors
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0334
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Ladew Topiary Gardens
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0399 /CH0089
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class DBR License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0475
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Wine Container Permits
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0527 /CH0092
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Residency Requirements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0845 /CH0107
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Cafe Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0318 Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Harford County - Warrant Intercept Program By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0322 Harford County - Charitable Gaming By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0328 /CH0086 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Applications for Licenses By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0329 /CH0087 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Inspectors By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 87
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0334 Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Ladew Topiary Gardens By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2015 - 2:00 PM
HB0399 /CH0089 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class DBR License By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 89
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0475 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Wine Container Permits By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0527 /CH0092 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Residency Requirements By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 92
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0845 /CH0107 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Cafe Licenses By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 107
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM