Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Harford County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0795 /CH0498
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Waiver From School Distance Restrictions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0990
Title
Harford County - Bingo
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1008 /CH0098 (SB1010/CH0097)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Publication of Notices
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1431
Title
Harford County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Collective Bargaining
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1500 /CH0736
Title
Sheriff of Harford County - Salary
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0795 /CH0498 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Waiver From School Distance Restrictions By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 498
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0990 Harford County - Bingo By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1008 /CH0098 (SB1010/CH0097) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Publication of Notices By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1431 Harford County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Collective Bargaining By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (36-0)
Appropriations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1500 /CH0736 Sheriff of Harford County - Salary By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 736
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM