Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Health And Government Operations Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0013 /CH0081
Title
Office of Cemetery Oversight - Perpetual Care Trust Funds and Preneed Trust Accounts - Regulation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0014
Title
Small Business Reserve Program - Procurements by Designated Procurement Units
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0102 /CH0082
Title
Procurement Advisory Council - Membership
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0105 /CH0083
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Powers - Authority to Award Funds and Make Agreements With Grantees and Payees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0106 /CH0084
Title
Senior Prescription Drug Assistance Program - Sunset Extension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0207 /CH0589
Title
State Capital Projects - High Performance Buildings - Maryland Green Building Council
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0534
Title
Maryland Intrastate Hospital Assistance Compact
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0590 /CH0413
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Waivers - Consolidation and Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0629 /CH0604
Title
Environmentally Preferable Procurement - Maryland Green Purchasing Committee
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0668 /CH0417
Title
Income Tax Credit - Health Enterprise Zones - Modifications
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1456 /CH0457
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - Jurisdiction
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1488
Title
State Procurement - Source Selection and Protest Appeals Procedures - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1510 /CH0460
Title
Behavioral Health Administration - Establishment and Duties
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1511
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Adult Dependent Care Providers - Maryland Background Check Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0823 (SB0893/CH0355)
Title
Health Insurance - Insurance Laws That Apply to Health Maintenance Organizations - Consolidation and Clarification
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0013 /CH0081 Office of Cemetery Oversight - Perpetual Care Trust Funds and Preneed Trust Accounts - Regulation By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Health and Government Operations
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0014 Small Business Reserve Program - Procurements by Designated Procurement Units By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0102 /CH0082 Procurement Advisory Council - Membership By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 82
Health and Government Operations
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0105 /CH0083 Maryland Health Care Commission - Powers - Authority to Award Funds and Make Agreements With Grantees and Payees By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 83
Health and Government Operations
1/15/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0106 /CH0084 Senior Prescription Drug Assistance Program - Sunset Extension By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 84
Health and Government Operations
1/15/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0207 /CH0589 State Capital Projects - High Performance Buildings - Maryland Green Building Council By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 589
Health and Government Operations
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0534 Maryland Intrastate Hospital Assistance Compact By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0590 /CH0413 Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Waivers - Consolidation and Repeal By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 413
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0629 /CH0604 Environmentally Preferable Procurement - Maryland Green Purchasing Committee By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 604
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0668 /CH0417 Income Tax Credit - Health Enterprise Zones - Modifications By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 417
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1456 /CH0457 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - Jurisdiction By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 457
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1488 State Procurement - Source Selection and Protest Appeals Procedures - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1510 /CH0460 Behavioral Health Administration - Establishment and Duties By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 460
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2014 - 12:30 PM
Finance
HB1511 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Adult Dependent Care Providers - Maryland Background Check Program By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2014 - 12:30 PM
HB0823 (SB0893/CH0355) Health Insurance - Insurance Laws That Apply to Health Maintenance Organizations - Consolidation and Clarification By Request - Other 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2014 - 12:30 PM
Finance
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM