Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Howard County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0590 /CH0150
Title
Howard County Board of Education – Election of Members Ho. Co. 01–19
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0591
Title
Howard County Board of Education - School Year - Start and End Dates Ho. Co. 25-19
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0869 /CH0701
Title
Howard County – Alcoholic Beverages – Marketplace License Ho. Co. 06–19
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1166 /CH0725
Title
Howard County - Authority to Impose Fees for Use of Disposable Bags Ho. Co. 04-19
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1306 /CH0151
Title
Howard County - Howard County Housing Commission - Subsidiary Entities Ho. Co. 26-19
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1409 /CH0744
Title
Howard County - School Facilities Surcharge - Rates Ho. Co. 03-19
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1405 /CH0311
Title
Howard County - Transfer Tax - Collection by Director of Finance Ho. Co. 30-19
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1406 /CH0152
Title
Howard County - Department of Correction - Authority to Establish Programs Ho. Co. 29-19
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0590 /CH0150 Howard County Board of Education – Election of Members Ho. Co. 01–19 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 150
Ways and Means
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0591 Howard County Board of Education - School Year - Start and End Dates Ho. Co. 25-19 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0869 /CH0701 Howard County – Alcoholic Beverages – Marketplace License Ho. Co. 06–19 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 701
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1166 /CH0725 Howard County - Authority to Impose Fees for Use of Disposable Bags Ho. Co. 04-19 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 725
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1306 /CH0151 Howard County - Howard County Housing Commission - Subsidiary Entities Ho. Co. 26-19 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151
Environment and Transportation
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1409 /CH0744 Howard County - School Facilities Surcharge - Rates Ho. Co. 03-19 By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 744
Appropriations
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1405 /CH0311 Howard County - Transfer Tax - Collection by Director of Finance Ho. Co. 30-19 By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Ways and Means
3/15/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1406 /CH0152 Howard County - Department of Correction - Authority to Establish Programs Ho. Co. 29-19 By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 152
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM