Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Howard County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0826
Title
Howard County – Residential Property and New Home Construction Advertisements – School District Information Ho. Co. 02–20
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1454
Title
Howard County - Transfer Tax - Rate Increase Authorization Ho. Co. 26-20
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1509
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Alcoholic Beverages Inspectors Ho. Co. 32-20
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1510
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Rental Subsidy Under the Howard County "Live Where You Work" Program Ho. Co. 20-20
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1511
Title
Howard County – Board of Education – Redetermination of Geographic Attendance Areas Ho. Co. 01–20
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1521
Title
Howard County - Sales of Residential Real Property - Notice of School District Boundary Changes Ho. Co. 04-20
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0826 Howard County – Residential Property and New Home Construction Advertisements – School District Information Ho. Co. 02–20 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1454 Howard County - Transfer Tax - Rate Increase Authorization Ho. Co. 26-20 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1509 Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Alcoholic Beverages Inspectors Ho. Co. 32-20 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1510 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Rental Subsidy Under the Howard County "Live Where You Work" Program Ho. Co. 20-20 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1511 Howard County – Board of Education – Redetermination of Geographic Attendance Areas Ho. Co. 01–20 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1521 Howard County - Sales of Residential Real Property - Notice of School District Boundary Changes Ho. Co. 04-20 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/18/2020 11:34 AM