Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Judiciary Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0076 /CH0610
Title
Department of State Police - Investigation Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0077 /CH0611
Title
Family Law - Missing Children - Reporting Requirements and Repeal of Advisory Council
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0078 /CH0092
Title
State Fire Marshal - Reporting Requirements - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0162
Title
Comptroller - Taxpayer Protection Act
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0192 /CH0382 (SB0360/CH0381)
Title
Juvenile Causes - Permanency Plans - Age Restrictions on Use of Another Planned Permanent Living Arrangement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0076 /CH0610 Department of State Police - Investigation Authority By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 610
Judiciary
1/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0077 /CH0611 Family Law - Missing Children - Reporting Requirements and Repeal of Advisory Council By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 611
Judiciary
1/28/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0078 /CH0092 State Fire Marshal - Reporting Requirements - Repeal By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 92
Judiciary
1/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0162 Comptroller - Taxpayer Protection Act By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Judiciary
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0192 /CH0382 (SB0360/CH0381) Juvenile Causes - Permanency Plans - Age Restrictions on Use of Another Planned Permanent Living Arrangement By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 382
Judiciary
2/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM