Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Montgomery County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0645 /CH0128
Title
Montgomery County - Sale of Alcoholic Beverages - Distance from Schools, Places of Worship, or Youth Centers MC 16-13
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0646 /CH0629 (SB0918)
Title
Gaming - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Veterans' Organizations MC 5-13
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0647 /CH0129
Title
Montgomery County - Town of Kensington - Beer and Wine Sampling or Tasting MC 9-13
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0648
Title
Montgomery County - Winery Special Event Permits - Farmers' Markets MC 3-13
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0649 /CH0130
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Beer Containers MC 4-13
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0670 /CH0132
Title
Montgomery County - Board of Education Districts - Town of Kensington in One District MC 1-13
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0671
Title
Montgomery County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone MC 2-13
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0672 /CH0133
Title
Montgomery County - Consumption of Wine Not Bought from License Holder - Class H Licenses MC 17-13
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0674 /CH0382
Title
Montgomery County - Board of Education - Compensation MC 8-13
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0675 /CH0134
Title
Montgomery County - Property Tax Credit for Qualified Enterprise Zone Property - Burtonsville MC 14-13
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0676
Title
Montgomery County - Nuisances in Multidwelling Buildings - Private Right of Action MC 10-13
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0677 /CH0135
Title
Montgomery County - Property Tax Credit for Qualified Enterprise Zone Property - Glenmont MC 18-13
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1510
Title
Montgomery County - Transportation - Block Grant
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0645 /CH0128 Montgomery County - Sale of Alcoholic Beverages - Distance from Schools, Places of Worship, or Youth Centers MC 16-13 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 128
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0646 /CH0629 (SB0918) Gaming - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Veterans' Organizations MC 5-13 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 629
Ways and Means
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0647 /CH0129 Montgomery County - Town of Kensington - Beer and Wine Sampling or Tasting MC 9-13 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0648 Montgomery County - Winery Special Event Permits - Farmers' Markets MC 3-13 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0649 /CH0130 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Beer Containers MC 4-13 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0670 /CH0132 Montgomery County - Board of Education Districts - Town of Kensington in One District MC 1-13 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 132
Ways and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0671 Montgomery County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone MC 2-13 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0672 /CH0133 Montgomery County - Consumption of Wine Not Bought from License Holder - Class H Licenses MC 17-13 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 133
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0674 /CH0382 Montgomery County - Board of Education - Compensation MC 8-13 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 382
Ways and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0675 /CH0134 Montgomery County - Property Tax Credit for Qualified Enterprise Zone Property - Burtonsville MC 14-13 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134
Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0676 Montgomery County - Nuisances in Multidwelling Buildings - Private Right of Action MC 10-13 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0677 /CH0135 Montgomery County - Property Tax Credit for Qualified Enterprise Zone Property - Glenmont MC 18-13 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 135
Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB1510 Montgomery County - Transportation - Block Grant By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM