Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Montgomery County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0143
Title
Carroll County and Montgomery County – Gaming – Bingo Games MC 13–18
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0144 /CH0119
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Country Club Off-Sale Permit MC 10-18
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0145 /CH0289
Title
Montgomery County - Kensington - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses MC 12-18
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0146 /CH0288
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class 7 Micro-Brewery License - Issuance MC 9-18
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0147
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Inspections and Statements During Initial License Year MC 7-18
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0148 /CH0120
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C Per Diem Licenses MC 8-18
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0150 /CH0121
Title
Montgomery County Board of Education Compensation Commission MC 1-18
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0153
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Dispensaries in Retail Grocery Stores MC 16-18
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0159 /CH0122
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Basket of Cheer Permit MC 21-18
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0171
Title
Montgomery County - Beer and Wine Licenses - Shochu and Soju MC 20-18
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0172 /CH0123
Title
Montgomery County - Archery Hunting Safety Zone - Position of Archery Hunter MC 24-18
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0173
Title
Montgomery County - Ranked Choice Voting MC 19-18
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0176
Title
Montgomery County - Uniformity of Property Tax Assessments - Country Clubs and Golf Courses MC 11-18
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0177 /CH0124
Title
Montgomery County – Alcoholic Beverages – Inspections, Food Sales Requirements, and Hours and Days of Sale MC 5–18
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0178 /CH0125
Title
Montgomery County Alcohol Modernization Act of 2018 MC 4-18
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0220 /CH0126
Title
Montgomery County - Housing Opportunities Commission of Montgomery County - Subsidiary Entities MC 18-18
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0278 /CH0127
Title
Montgomery County – Housing Opportunities Commission – Binding Arbitration – Revisions MC 14–18
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0594 (SB0902)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Poolesville Grape Crushing Economic Development Facility
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0995
Title
Montgomery County - Residential Leases - Just Cause Eviction MC 15-18
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0143 Carroll County and Montgomery County – Gaming – Bingo Games MC 13–18 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0144 /CH0119 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Country Club Off-Sale Permit MC 10-18 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0145 /CH0289 Montgomery County - Kensington - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses MC 12-18 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0146 /CH0288 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class 7 Micro-Brewery License - Issuance MC 9-18 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0147 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Inspections and Statements During Initial License Year MC 7-18 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0148 /CH0120 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C Per Diem Licenses MC 8-18 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0150 /CH0121 Montgomery County Board of Education Compensation Commission MC 1-18 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Ways and Means
2/01/2018 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0153 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Dispensaries in Retail Grocery Stores MC 16-18 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0159 /CH0122 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Basket of Cheer Permit MC 21-18 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0171 Montgomery County - Beer and Wine Licenses - Shochu and Soju MC 20-18 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0172 /CH0123 Montgomery County - Archery Hunting Safety Zone - Position of Archery Hunter MC 24-18 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 123
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0173 Montgomery County - Ranked Choice Voting MC 19-18 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0176 Montgomery County - Uniformity of Property Tax Assessments - Country Clubs and Golf Courses MC 11-18 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0177 /CH0124 Montgomery County – Alcoholic Beverages – Inspections, Food Sales Requirements, and Hours and Days of Sale MC 5–18 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0178 /CH0125 Montgomery County Alcohol Modernization Act of 2018 MC 4-18 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0220 /CH0126 Montgomery County - Housing Opportunities Commission of Montgomery County - Subsidiary Entities MC 18-18 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 126
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0278 /CH0127 Montgomery County – Housing Opportunities Commission – Binding Arbitration – Revisions MC 14–18 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127
Appropriations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0594 (SB0902) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Poolesville Grape Crushing Economic Development Facility By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 4:00 PM
HB0995 Montgomery County - Residential Leases - Just Cause Eviction MC 15-18 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM