Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Montgomery County Senators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0298 (HB0136/CH0386)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Montgomery County - Beer Festivals
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0299 /CH0482 (HB0147)
Title
Montgomery County - Maryland Tort Claims Act - Human Services Torts
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0300 /CH0483 (HB0142)
Title
Montgomery County - Proportion of Food and Alcoholic Beverages Sales - Class B Licenses and Class B-BWL (H-M) Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0301 (HB0137/CH0387)
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0302 /CH0289 (HB0131)
Title
Montgomery County - City of Takoma Park - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B On- and Off-Sale License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0305 /CH0484 (HB0132/CH0485)
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer Sales and Delivery to Retail Dealers
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0306 /CH0054 (HB0141)
Title
Montgomery County - Barbershops - Restriction on Operation Repealed
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0307 (HB0144/CH0586)
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine and Liquor Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0308 (HB0139)
Title
Montgomery County - Law Enforcement Vehicles - Automated External Defibrillator
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0309 /CH0290 (HB0138)
Title
Montgomery County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0310 /CH0055 (HB0140)
Title
Montgomery County - Micro-Brewery Licenses and Class D Beer and Light Wine Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0311 (HB0146/CH0388)
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special BWL Community Performing Arts Facility License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0312 (HB0143)
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages Sales - Prohibition on Use of Self-Scanning Cash Registers
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0313 (HB0135/CH0385)
Title
Montgomery County - Town of Kensington - Alcoholic Beverages - Special B-K Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0459 /CH0504 (HB0269)
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine and Liquor (Clubhouse/Lodge) License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0657 /CH0324 (HB0463)
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine and Liquor Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0815 /CH0197 (HB0638)
Title
Criminal Law - Telecommunication Devices in Place of Confinement - Montgomery County Work Release and Prerelease Programs
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1025 (HB0960)
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Residency Requirement Exemption
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0298 (HB0136/CH0386) Alcoholic Beverages - Montgomery County - Beer Festivals By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0299 /CH0482 (HB0147) Montgomery County - Maryland Tort Claims Act - Human Services Torts By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 482
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0300 /CH0483 (HB0142) Montgomery County - Proportion of Food and Alcoholic Beverages Sales - Class B Licenses and Class B-BWL (H-M) Licenses By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 483
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0301 (HB0137/CH0387) Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon License By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0302 /CH0289 (HB0131) Montgomery County - City of Takoma Park - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B On- and Off-Sale License By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0305 /CH0484 (HB0132/CH0485) Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer Sales and Delivery to Retail Dealers By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 484
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0306 /CH0054 (HB0141) Montgomery County - Barbershops - Restriction on Operation Repealed By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 54
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2014 - 1:45 PM
Economic Matters
SB0307 (HB0144/CH0586) Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine and Liquor Licenses By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0308 (HB0139) Montgomery County - Law Enforcement Vehicles - Automated External Defibrillator By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2014 - 1:45 PM
SB0309 /CH0290 (HB0138) Montgomery County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 290
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0310 /CH0055 (HB0140) Montgomery County - Micro-Brewery Licenses and Class D Beer and Light Wine Licenses By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 55
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0311 (HB0146/CH0388) Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special BWL Community Performing Arts Facility License By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0312 (HB0143) Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages Sales - Prohibition on Use of Self-Scanning Cash Registers By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0313 (HB0135/CH0385) Montgomery County - Town of Kensington - Alcoholic Beverages - Special B-K Licenses By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0459 /CH0504 (HB0269) Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine and Liquor (Clubhouse/Lodge) License By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 504
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0657 /CH0324 (HB0463) Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine and Liquor Licenses By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 324
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0815 /CH0197 (HB0638) Criminal Law - Telecommunication Devices in Place of Confinement - Montgomery County Work Release and Prerelease Programs By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1025 (HB0960) Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Residency Requirement Exemption By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM