Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

President, The

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0125 (HB0100/CH0423)
Title
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2014)
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Administration
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0126 (HB0101/CH0424)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2013, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2006, 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, and 2012
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Administration
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0127 (HB0102/CH0425)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Administration
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0141 (HB0115/CH0426)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Qualified Zone Academy Bonds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Administration
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0273 /CH0154 (HB0225/CH0155)
Title
Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Administration
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0274 (HB0228/CH0159)
Title
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Administration
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0275 (HB0226/CH0003)
Title
Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Administration
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0276 /CH0156 (HB0295)
Title
Death Penalty Repeal - Substitution of Life Without the Possibility of Parole
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Administration
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0277 (HB0229/CH0004)
Title
State Aid for Public Education - Certification of Net Taxable Income
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Administration
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0278 /CH0001 (HB0227/CH0002)
Title
Maryland Employment Advancement Right Now (EARN) Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Administration
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0279 /CH0157 (HB0224/CH0158)
Title
Election Law - Improving Access to Voting
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Administration
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0281 /CH0427 (HB0294)
Title
Firearm Safety Act of 2013
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Administration
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0538 (HB0560/CH0005)
Title
Public-Private Partnerships
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Administration
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0841 /CH0428 (HB0863)
Title
Higher Education Fair Share Act
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Administration
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1054 (HB1515/CH0429)
Title
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Administration
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0236 (HB0210)
Title
State Board of Foresters - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0237 /CH0211 (HB0206)
Title
Health Occupations - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0238 /CH0212 (HB0209)
Title
State Board of Public Accountancy - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0239 /CH0034 (HB0083)
Title
Judgeships - Court of Special Appeals, Circuit Courts, and District Court
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0283 /CH0042
Title
Annual Curative Bill
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0284 /CH0043
Title
Annual Corrective Bill
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1039 (HB1499/CH0419)
Title
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0125 (HB0100/CH0423) Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2014) By Request - Administration 3 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
SB0126 (HB0101/CH0424) Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2013, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2006, 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, and 2012 By Request - Administration 3 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
SB0127 (HB0102/CH0425) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013 By Request - Administration 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0141 (HB0115/CH0426) Creation of a State Debt - Qualified Zone Academy Bonds By Request - Administration 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0273 /CH0154 (HB0225/CH0155) Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013 By Request - Administration 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/07/2013 - 1:45 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0274 (HB0228/CH0159) Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013 By Request - Administration 3 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0275 (HB0226/CH0003) Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013 By Request - Administration 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0276 /CH0156 (HB0295) Death Penalty Repeal - Substitution of Life Without the Possibility of Parole By Request - Administration 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 156
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/08/2013 - 12:30 PM
SB0277 (HB0229/CH0004) State Aid for Public Education - Certification of Net Taxable Income By Request - Administration 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0278 /CH0001 (HB0227/CH0002) Maryland Employment Advancement Right Now (EARN) Program By Request - Administration 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1
Finance
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0279 /CH0157 (HB0224/CH0158) Election Law - Improving Access to Voting By Request - Administration 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0281 /CH0427 (HB0294) Firearm Safety Act of 2013 By Request - Administration 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/08/2013 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0538 (HB0560/CH0005) Public-Private Partnerships By Request - Administration 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0841 /CH0428 (HB0863) Higher Education Fair Share Act By Request - Administration 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 428
Finance
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1054 (HB1515/CH0429) Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013 By Request - Administration 3 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB0236 (HB0210) State Board of Foresters - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0237 /CH0211 (HB0206) Health Occupations - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0238 /CH0212 (HB0209) State Board of Public Accountancy - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/07/2013 - 1:45 PM
Economic Matters
SB0239 /CH0034 (HB0083) Judgeships - Court of Special Appeals, Circuit Courts, and District Court By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0283 /CH0042 Annual Curative Bill By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 42
Rules
1/30/2013 - 10:45 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0284 /CH0043 Annual Corrective Bill By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Rules
1/30/2013 - 10:45 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB1039 (HB1499/CH0419) Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013 By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM