Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Ways And Means Committee, Chair

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0089 /CH0654
Title
Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officers - Administration
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0090 /CH0102
Title
Personal Property Tax - Exemption for Low Assessments
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0193 /CH0374 (SB0043/CH0373)
Title
High School Diploma by Examination - Eligibility Requirements - Exemption
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0089 /CH0654 Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officers - Administration By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 654
Ways and Means
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0090 /CH0102 Personal Property Tax - Exemption for Low Assessments By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 102
Ways and Means
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0193 /CH0374 (SB0043/CH0373) High School Diploma by Examination - Eligibility Requirements - Exemption By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 374
Economic Matters
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM