Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Washington County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0191 /CH0405 (SB0071)
Title
County Superintendents of Schools - Reappointment Exemption in Washington County and Recruitment Recommendations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0790 (SB0635/CH0187)
Title
Washington County - Board of Education - Alternative Teacher Certification Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0793 /CH0276 (SB0636)
Title
Washington County - County Clerk
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0794 (SB0634/CH0186)
Title
Washington County - Liquor Tasting License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0795 /CH0277 (SB0632)
Title
Washington County - Board of License Commissioners - Expungement of Violations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0797 /CH0278 (SB0630)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Washington County - Population Ratio Quota
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0800 (SB0638)
Title
Washington County - Maryland Building Performance Standards - Modifications - Local Enforcement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0801 /CH0280 (SB0750)
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Conversion of Class P Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0835 /CH0105 (SB0633)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Washington County - Refillable Container Permit
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0836 (SB0631/CH0185)
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wine Tasting License for Class B License Holders - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1162 (SB0913/CH0209)
Title
Washington County - Tax Increment Financing - Application of Bond Proceeds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1164 (SB0925/CH0211)
Title
Washington County - Property Tax Credit - Economic Development Projects
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1170 (SB0637/CH0188)
Title
Washington County - Hotel Rental Tax Revenue Distribution - Annual Reports
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1171 (SB0923)
Title
Washington County - Property Tax Credit - Disabled Veterans
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0191 /CH0405 (SB0071) County Superintendents of Schools - Reappointment Exemption in Washington County and Recruitment Recommendations By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 405
Ways and Means
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0790 (SB0635/CH0187) Washington County - Board of Education - Alternative Teacher Certification Program By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0793 /CH0276 (SB0636) Washington County - County Clerk By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0794 (SB0634/CH0186) Washington County - Liquor Tasting License By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0795 /CH0277 (SB0632) Washington County - Board of License Commissioners - Expungement of Violations By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0797 /CH0278 (SB0630) Alcoholic Beverages - Washington County - Population Ratio Quota By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0800 (SB0638) Washington County - Maryland Building Performance Standards - Modifications - Local Enforcement By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0801 /CH0280 (SB0750) Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Conversion of Class P Licenses By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 280
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0835 /CH0105 (SB0633) Alcoholic Beverages - Washington County - Refillable Container Permit By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0836 (SB0631/CH0185) Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wine Tasting License for Class B License Holders - Repeal By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1162 (SB0913/CH0209) Washington County - Tax Increment Financing - Application of Bond Proceeds By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1164 (SB0925/CH0211) Washington County - Property Tax Credit - Economic Development Projects By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1170 (SB0637/CH0188) Washington County - Hotel Rental Tax Revenue Distribution - Annual Reports By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1171 (SB0923) Washington County - Property Tax Credit - Disabled Veterans By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM