Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Washington County Senators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0630 (HB0797/CH0278)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Washington County - Population Ratio Quota
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0631 /CH0185 (HB0836)
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wine Tasting License for Class B License Holders - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0632 (HB0795/CH0277)
Title
Washington County - Board of License Commissioners - Expungement of Violations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0633 (HB0835/CH0105)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Washington County - Refillable Container Permit
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0634 /CH0186 (HB0794)
Title
Washington County - Liquor Tasting License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0635 /CH0187 (HB0790)
Title
State Board of Education and the Professional Standards and Teacher Education Board - Alternative Teacher Certification Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0636 (HB0793/CH0276)
Title
Washington County - County Clerk
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0637 /CH0188 (HB1170)
Title
Washington County - Hotel Rental Tax Revenue Distribution - Annual Reports
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0638 (HB0800)
Title
Washington County - Maryland Building Performance Standards - Modifications - Local Enforcement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0750 (HB0801/CH0280)
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Conversion of Class P Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0751
Title
Washington County - Board of Education - Financing Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0913 /CH0209 (HB1162)
Title
Washington County - Tax Increment Financing - Application of Bond Proceeds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0923 (HB1171)
Title
Washington County - Property Tax Credit - Disabled Veterans
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0925 /CH0211 (HB1164)
Title
Washington County - Property Tax Credit - Economic Development Projects
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0630 (HB0797/CH0278) Alcoholic Beverages - Washington County - Population Ratio Quota By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0631 /CH0185 (HB0836) Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wine Tasting License for Class B License Holders - Repeal By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0632 (HB0795/CH0277) Washington County - Board of License Commissioners - Expungement of Violations By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0633 (HB0835/CH0105) Alcoholic Beverages - Washington County - Refillable Container Permit By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0634 /CH0186 (HB0794) Washington County - Liquor Tasting License By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0635 /CH0187 (HB0790) State Board of Education and the Professional Standards and Teacher Education Board - Alternative Teacher Certification Program By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 187
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0636 (HB0793/CH0276) Washington County - County Clerk By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0637 /CH0188 (HB1170) Washington County - Hotel Rental Tax Revenue Distribution - Annual Reports By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 188
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0638 (HB0800) Washington County - Maryland Building Performance Standards - Modifications - Local Enforcement By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0750 (HB0801/CH0280) Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Conversion of Class P Licenses By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0751 Washington County - Board of Education - Financing Authority By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; Withdrawn
Rules
SB0913 /CH0209 (HB1162) Washington County - Tax Increment Financing - Application of Bond Proceeds By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 209
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2015 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
4/08/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0923 (HB1171) Washington County - Property Tax Credit - Disabled Veterans By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2015 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
4/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0925 /CH0211 (HB1164) Washington County - Property Tax Credit - Economic Development Projects By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2015 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
4/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM