Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Wicomico County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0197 /CH0588 (SB0019/CH0589)
Title
Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Bed and Breakfast License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0198 /CH0590 (SB0006/CH0591)
Title
Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Basket of Cheer Permit
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0199 /CH0592
Title
Wicomico County - Deer Hunting - Sundays
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0200
Title
Wicomico County – Sales and Use Tax Exemption – Aircraft Parts and Equipment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1218
Title
Wicomico County - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0197 /CH0588 (SB0019/CH0589) Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Bed and Breakfast License By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 588
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0198 /CH0590 (SB0006/CH0591) Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Basket of Cheer Permit By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 590
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0199 /CH0592 Wicomico County - Deer Hunting - Sundays By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 592
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0200 Wicomico County – Sales and Use Tax Exemption – Aircraft Parts and Equipment By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1218 Wicomico County - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM