Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0064 /CH0220
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Licensing Boards - Judicial Review
Sponsor
Delegate Vitale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0102 (SB0093)
Title
Civil Action - Wrongfully Selling or Furnishing Alcoholic Beverages
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0290 /CH0236
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Winery Off-Site Permit Holders - Comptroller Notification and Attendance Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0291 /CH0237
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Direct Wine Shippers - Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0311 (SB0704)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Supermarkets - Class B and Class BLX Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0330 (SB0643/CH0190)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries - Additional License
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0526 (SB0673/CH0192)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Brewing Company Off-Site Permit and Nonprofit Beer Festival Permit
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0560 (SB0674)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Brewery License - On-Premises Consumption
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0827 /CH0282
Title
Alcoholic Beverage Taxes - Wine Tax Revenue Distribution
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1061 (SB0300)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Class A Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1288 /CH0475
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Sale of Powdered Alcohol - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0093 (HB0102)
Title
Civil Action - Wrongfully Selling or Furnishing Alcoholic Beverages
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0213
Title
Legal Drinking Age - Active Duty Members of the Armed Forces
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0300 (HB1061)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Class A Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0643 /CH0190 (HB0330)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries - Additional License
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0673 /CH0192 (HB0526)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Brewing Company Off-Site Permit and Nonprofit Beer Festival Permit
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0674 (HB0560)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Brewery License - On-Premises Consumption
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0704 (HB0311)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Supermarkets - Class B and Class BLX Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0707 /CH0049
Title
Alcoholic Beverage Tax Returns - Manufacturers and Wholesalers - Due Date
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0888
Title
Task Force to Study the Issuance of Beer and Wine Licenses to Chain Stores
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0911
Title
Comptroller - Special Event Liquor Permit
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0920
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Charitable Donations
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0937
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Powdered Alcoholic Beverages - Ban on Sales
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0064 /CH0220 Alcoholic Beverages - Local Licensing Boards - Judicial Review Delegate Vitale 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 220
Economic Matters
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0102 (SB0093) Civil Action - Wrongfully Selling or Furnishing Alcoholic Beverages Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0290 /CH0236 Alcoholic Beverages - Winery Off-Site Permit Holders - Comptroller Notification and Attendance Restrictions Delegate Barkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 236
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0291 /CH0237 Alcoholic Beverages - Direct Wine Shippers - Reporting Requirements Delegate Barkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0311 (SB0704) Alcoholic Beverages - Supermarkets - Class B and Class BLX Licenses Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0330 (SB0643/CH0190) Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries - Additional License Allegany County Delegation 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0526 (SB0673/CH0192) Alcoholic Beverages - Brewing Company Off-Site Permit and Nonprofit Beer Festival Permit Delegate Barkley 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0560 (SB0674) Alcoholic Beverages - Brewery License - On-Premises Consumption Delegate Barkley 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0827 /CH0282 Alcoholic Beverage Taxes - Wine Tax Revenue Distribution Delegate Hixson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 282
Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1061 (SB0300) Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Class A Licenses Delegate Barkley 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1288 /CH0475 Alcoholic Beverages - Sale of Powdered Alcohol - Prohibition Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 475
Economic Matters
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0093 (HB0102) Civil Action - Wrongfully Selling or Furnishing Alcoholic Beverages Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0213 Legal Drinking Age - Active Duty Members of the Armed Forces Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0300 (HB1061) Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Class A Licenses Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0643 /CH0190 (HB0330) Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries - Additional License Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 190
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0673 /CH0192 (HB0526) Alcoholic Beverages - Brewing Company Off-Site Permit and Nonprofit Beer Festival Permit Senator Young 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 192
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0674 (HB0560) Alcoholic Beverages - Brewery License - On-Premises Consumption Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0704 (HB0311) Alcoholic Beverages - Supermarkets - Class B and Class BLX Licenses Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0707 /CH0049 Alcoholic Beverage Tax Returns - Manufacturers and Wholesalers - Due Date Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0888 Task Force to Study the Issuance of Beer and Wine Licenses to Chain Stores Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0911 Comptroller - Special Event Liquor Permit Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0920 Alcoholic Beverages - Charitable Donations Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0937 Alcoholic Beverages - Powdered Alcoholic Beverages - Ban on Sales Senator Madaleno 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM