Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0156 (SB0295)
Title
Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Sale of Harvested Cover Crops
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0305
Title
Department of Agriculture - Maryland Made Promotion Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0900 (SB0911)
Title
Alcohol and Tobacco Commission - Clarifications
Sponsor
Delegate Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0902 (SB0765)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - License Applications - Durational Residency Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1046
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class MD License
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1269
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturers - Direct Transfer Permit
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1333
Title
Minority Participation in the Alcoholic Beverages Industry - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1435
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Retail License Holders - Alcohol Awareness Program
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0021
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses - Requirements for Food Sales
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0130
Title
Alcoholic Beverages – License Requirements – Citizenship
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0295 (HB0156)
Title
Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Sale of Harvested Cover Crops
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0321
Title
Policing Authority - Comptroller's Office and Alcohol and Tobacco Commission
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0765 (HB0902)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - License Applications - Durational Residency Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0839
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Permits and Brewery Limits
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0911 (HB0900)
Title
Alcohol and Tobacco Commission - Clarifications
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1037
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Prohibited Acts - Defense to Prosecution for Sale to Underage Individuals
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1068
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Fulfillment Warehouse Permit
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0156 (SB0295) Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Sale of Harvested Cover Crops Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0305 Department of Agriculture - Maryland Made Promotion Fund Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0900 (SB0911) Alcohol and Tobacco Commission - Clarifications Delegate Miller 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0902 (SB0765) Alcoholic Beverages - License Applications - Durational Residency Requirements Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1046 Alcoholic Beverages - Class MD License Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1269 Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturers - Direct Transfer Permit Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1333 Minority Participation in the Alcoholic Beverages Industry - Study Delegate Barnes, D. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1435 Alcoholic Beverages - Retail License Holders - Alcohol Awareness Program Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0021 Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses - Requirements for Food Sales Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0130 Alcoholic Beverages – License Requirements – Citizenship Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0295 (HB0156) Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Sale of Harvested Cover Crops Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0321 Policing Authority - Comptroller's Office and Alcohol and Tobacco Commission Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0765 (HB0902) Alcoholic Beverages - License Applications - Durational Residency Requirements Senator Miller 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0839 Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Permits and Brewery Limits Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0911 (HB0900) Alcohol and Tobacco Commission - Clarifications Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1037 Alcoholic Beverages - Prohibited Acts - Defense to Prosecution for Sale to Underage Individuals Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
SB1068 Alcoholic Beverages - Fulfillment Warehouse Permit Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/17/2020 2:05 PM