Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Abandoned Property

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0372
Title
Real Property - Vacant and Abandoned Residential Property
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0511 /CH0428
Title
Real Property - Residential Property - Ground Leases
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0607
Title
Prince George's County - Property Tax - Transforming Neighborhood Initiative Residential Rehabilitation Tax Credit PG 414-15
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0786 /CH0103 (SB0613)
Title
Self-Service Storage Facilities - Enforcement of Lien - Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0935 /CH0289
Title
Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 410-15
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1177
Title
Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction and Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 425-15
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0197
Title
Municipalities - Vacant and Blighted Buildings
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0613 (HB0786/CH0103)
Title
Self-Service Storage Facilities - Enforcement of Lien - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489
Appropriations
3/03/2015 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0372 Real Property - Vacant and Abandoned Residential Property Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0511 /CH0428 Real Property - Residential Property - Ground Leases Delegate Holmes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 428
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0607 Prince George's County - Property Tax - Transforming Neighborhood Initiative Residential Rehabilitation Tax Credit PG 414-15 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0786 /CH0103 (SB0613) Self-Service Storage Facilities - Enforcement of Lien - Procedures Delegate Davis 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Economic Matters
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0935 /CH0289 Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 410-15 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289
Ways and Means
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1177 Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction and Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 425-15 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0197 Municipalities - Vacant and Blighted Buildings Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0613 (HB0786/CH0103) Self-Service Storage Facilities - Enforcement of Lien - Procedures Senator Astle 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Finance
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM