Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Abandoned Property

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0032
Title
Restoring and Sustaining Baltimore City Communities Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0036 /CH0607
Title
Rebuilding Baltimore City Communities Act of 2016
Sponsor
Baltimore City Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0385 /CH0484
Title
Baltimore City - Abandoned Property - Tax Sales - Ground Rent
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1083
Title
Prince George's County - Abandoned Property - Special Property Tax Rate PG 432-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1153
Title
Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction and Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 431-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1475
Title
Municipalities - Vacant and Blighted Buildings - Registration, Remediation, and Taxation
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0248
Title
Municipalities - Vacant or Blighted Buildings - Registration and Remediation
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0032 Restoring and Sustaining Baltimore City Communities Act of 2016 Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/27/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB0036 /CH0607 Rebuilding Baltimore City Communities Act of 2016 Baltimore City Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 607
Ways and Means
1/27/2016 - 2:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0385 /CH0484 Baltimore City - Abandoned Property - Tax Sales - Ground Rent Delegate Anderson 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 484
Ways and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1083 Prince George's County - Abandoned Property - Special Property Tax Rate PG 432-16 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1153 Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction and Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 431-16 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2016 - 2:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1475 Municipalities - Vacant and Blighted Buildings - Registration, Remediation, and Taxation Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
Ways and Means
SB0248 Municipalities - Vacant or Blighted Buildings - Registration and Remediation Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM