Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Abandoned Property

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0235
Title
Abandoned Private Cemeteries - Repair or Maintenance by County or Municipality
Sponsor
Delegate Knotts
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0659 /CH0615 (SB0823/CH0616)
Title
Task Force to Study Tax Sales in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0702 (SB1033/CH0617)
Title
Residential Property - Vacant and Abandoned Property - Expedited Foreclosure
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0838 (SB0487/CH0595)
Title
Baltimore City - Residential Ground Leases - Abandoned Property
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1168 /CH0618 (SB0957/CH0619)
Title
Counties and Municipalities - Land Bank Authorities
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1253 /CH0408
Title
State Boat Act - Removal of Abandoned or Sunken Vessels
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1257
Title
Prince George's County - Abandoned Property - Special Property Tax Rate
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1291 (SB0856/CH0839)
Title
Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding - Abandoned Property Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1437 (SB1184)
Title
Foreclosed and Vacant Residential Property - Common Ownership Communities - Payment of Regular Assessments
Sponsor
Delegate Proctor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1567
Title
Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Release of Liens on Vacant Property PG 413-17
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1573 /CH0819
Title
Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction and Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 411-17
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0487 /CH0595 (HB0838)
Title
Baltimore City - Residential Ground Leases - Abandoned Property
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0803
Title
Frederick County - Blighted Property - Nuisance Abatement
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0823 /CH0616 (HB0659/CH0615)
Title
Task Force to Study Tax Sales in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0856 /CH0839 (HB1291)
Title
Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding - Abandoned Property Funds
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0957 /CH0619 (HB1168/CH0618)
Title
Counties and Municipalities - Land Bank Authorities
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1033 /CH0617 (HB0702)
Title
Residential Property - Vacant and Abandoned Property - Expedited Foreclosure
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1184 (HB1437)
Title
Foreclosed and Vacant Residential Property - Common Ownership Communities - Payment of Regular Assessments
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0235 Abandoned Private Cemeteries - Repair or Maintenance by County or Municipality Delegate Knotts 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0659 /CH0615 (SB0823/CH0616) Task Force to Study Tax Sales in Maryland Delegate Angel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 615
Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0702 (SB1033/CH0617) Residential Property - Vacant and Abandoned Property - Expedited Foreclosure Delegate Holmes 2 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0838 (SB0487/CH0595) Baltimore City - Residential Ground Leases - Abandoned Property Delegate McIntosh 4 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1168 /CH0618 (SB0957/CH0619) Counties and Municipalities - Land Bank Authorities Delegate Holmes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 618
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1253 /CH0408 State Boat Act - Removal of Abandoned or Sunken Vessels Delegate Long 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 408
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1257 Prince George's County - Abandoned Property - Special Property Tax Rate Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1291 (SB0856/CH0839) Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding - Abandoned Property Funds Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Appropriations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1437 (SB1184) Foreclosed and Vacant Residential Property - Common Ownership Communities - Payment of Regular Assessments Delegate Proctor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1567 Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Release of Liens on Vacant Property PG 413-17 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1573 /CH0819 Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction and Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 411-17 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 819
Ways and Means
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0487 /CH0595 (HB0838) Baltimore City - Residential Ground Leases - Abandoned Property Senator McFadden 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 595
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0803 Frederick County - Blighted Property - Nuisance Abatement Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0823 /CH0616 (HB0659/CH0615) Task Force to Study Tax Sales in Maryland Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 616
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0856 /CH0839 (HB1291) Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding - Abandoned Property Funds Senator Guzzone 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 839
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0957 /CH0619 (HB1168/CH0618) Counties and Municipalities - Land Bank Authorities Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 619
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
SB1033 /CH0617 (HB0702) Residential Property - Vacant and Abandoned Property - Expedited Foreclosure Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 617
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB1184 (HB1437) Foreclosed and Vacant Residential Property - Common Ownership Communities - Payment of Regular Assessments Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM