Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Abandoned Vehicles

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0238 /CH0777
Title
Prince George’s County – Vehicle Laws – Authority to Tow Vehicles PG 418–18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0632 /CH0262 (SB0276/CH0263)
Title
Carroll County - Unlicensed Junk Vehicles and Parts - Repeal
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1770 (SB0521)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Towing Companies - Disposal of Abandoned Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0276 /CH0263 (HB0632/CH0262)
Title
Carroll County - Unlicensed Junk Vehicles and Parts - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0521 (HB1770)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Towing Companies - Disposal of Abandoned Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0238 /CH0777 Prince George’s County – Vehicle Laws – Authority to Tow Vehicles PG 418–18 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 777
Environment and Transportation
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0632 /CH0262 (SB0276/CH0263) Carroll County - Unlicensed Junk Vehicles and Parts - Repeal Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1770 (SB0521) Vehicle Laws - Towing Companies - Disposal of Abandoned Vehicles Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0276 /CH0263 (HB0632/CH0262) Carroll County - Unlicensed Junk Vehicles and Parts - Repeal Senator Ready 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 263
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0521 (HB1770) Vehicle Laws - Towing Companies - Disposal of Abandoned Vehicles Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM